MA H1760 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating certain individuals applying for or receiving unemployment benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to unemployment insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Accompanied S981 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S981 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1760.pdf |