MA H1776 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a liberty bell replica relocation feasibility fund study. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Establishing a liberty bell feasibility study
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1776 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1776.pdf |