MA H1780 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the acquisition of land for the development and construction of an underground railroad, and a civil rights and black heritage museum in the city of Springfield. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To authorize the acquisition of land, the development and construction of an underground railroad, civil rights and black heritage museum and cultural center in Springfield.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1780 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13064&generalCourtId=1 |