MA H1784 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the position of poet laureate of the Commonwealth. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the position of poet laureate for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1785 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1784 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1784.pdf |