MA H18 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3589
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to explosive bonds So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 17) as relates to explosive bonds. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to explosive bonds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3589 |
2013-06-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3589 (Replaced by) 2013-07-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H18 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H18.pdf |