MA H1806 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate community corrections. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to community corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1522 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2913
S1449 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H3012 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S165 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1199 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2678 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2163 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2022
S1449 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H3012 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S165 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1199 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2678 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2163 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1806.pdf |