MA H181 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to early intervention services for children with prenatal exposure to opioids. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to early intervention services for children with prenatal exposure to opioids
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4806 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H181 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H181.pdf |