MA H1815 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that network hospitals be compensated for behavioral health services to certain MassHealth patients. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
To require equitable payment from the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4234 |
2013-06-20 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-04-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1815 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1815.pdf |