MA H1821 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to shared municipal legal representation. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to authorizing governmental bodies and other approved parties to use shared legal representation and consultants in matters of common interest
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1821 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1821.pdf |