MA H1825 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative expungement and sealing of records. The Judiciary.
Title
Supporting survivors of trafficking and abuse and encouraging increased access to opportunities through expungement and/or sealing of records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1650 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1551 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1512 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1485 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S998 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S924 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S947 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1551 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1512 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1485 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S998 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S924 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S947 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1825 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1825.pdf |