MA H1839 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - New draft substituted, see H4545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - New draft substituted, see H4545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the powers of tree wardens in municipalities in the Commonwealth. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To update the public shade tree law
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] |
Sen. Thomas Kennedy [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | House | New draft substituted, see H4545 |
2012-12-20 | House | Read second |
2012-12-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and |
2012-12-17 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment |
2012-04-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4545 (Replaced by) 2012-12-31 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1839 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10603&generalCourtId=1 |