MA H1839 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to handicapped parking spaces regulated by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
To ensure adequate handicapped parking
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. James Miceli [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1839.pdf |