MA H1845 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a special commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Creating a commission to study the effects of unfunded mandates on municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H203 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1978 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1978 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1845 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1845.pdf |