MA H1860 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the tuition of children under the control of the Department of Transitional Assistance living in family shelters. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the tuition of children under the control of the Department of Transitional Assistance living in family shelters
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3698 |
2011-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3698 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1860 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12112&generalCourtId=1 |