MA H1864 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the board of registration in naturopathy. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the board of registration in naturopathy
Sponsors
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by S1222 |
2019-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1706 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S165 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H889 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3873 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1222 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
H1706 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S165 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H889 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3873 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1222 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1864 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1864.pdf |