MA H187 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1095
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the personal care allowance of residents of long-term care facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To increase the personal needs allowance for residents of long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-21 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-11-21 | House | Accompanied by H1095 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1095 (Replaces) 2011-11-21 - Accompanied H187
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H187 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11134&generalCourtId=1 |