MA H1870 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to private sale requirements for used vehicles and requiring that the Registry of Motor Vehicles create and maintain an approved bill of sale form for use by private sellers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to private sale requirements for used vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4537 |
2017-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2002 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H759 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4537 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2002 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H759 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4537 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1870 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1870.pdf |