MA H1880 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists
Sponsors
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4443 |
2019-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1516 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2698
S919 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4443 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2698
S919 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4443 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1880 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1880.pdf |