MA H189 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4048
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4048
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4048
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of the practice of medical physics. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to medical physics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4048 |
2015-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4048 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H189 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H189.pdf |