MA H1894 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transportation of alcoholic beverages and property by agricultural, common or contract carriers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to carriers of property by motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-26 | House | Accompanied by H3414 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S568 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1908 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2058
H3414 (Replaces) 2017-06-26 - Accompanied H1894
S2058 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2092
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H192 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1879 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
S2139 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2261
S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S568 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1908 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2058
H3414 (Replaces) 2017-06-26 - Accompanied H1894
S2058 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2092
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H192 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1879 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
S2139 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2261
S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1894 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1894.pdf |