MA H1901 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of a framework of health and well-being consistent with the definitions provided by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Public Health.
Title
To advance health and well-being for all Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-10-04 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1687 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S69 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1300 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H3000 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S69 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1300 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H3000 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1901 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1901.pdf |