MA H1917 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taking or transmitting of images of crime victims by first responders. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to taking or transmitting images of crime victims by first responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-08-01 | House | Enacted |
2022-08-01 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-08-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Read third |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3092 |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S3092 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-03-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S958 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1917 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1917.pdf |