MA H1922 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to death certificates. Public Health.
Title
Relative to death certificates
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3480 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3725 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3480 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3725 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1922.pdf |