MA H1926 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish penalties for threatening an employee of Department of Children and Families. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect employees of DCF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2744 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H87 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H88
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2744 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H87 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H88
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1926.pdf |