MA H1932 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to public health warnings of potential dangers to humans associated with the West Nile Virus. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the issuance of public health warnings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-11-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-11-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-07-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1932 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1932.pdf |