MA H1934 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2063
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ban plastic beads used in facial scrubs, shampoos and toothpastes. Public Health.
Title
Relative to micro-bead free waters
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4635 |
2015-11-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-11-25 | House | Accompanied by H2063 |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2063 (Replaces) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied H1934
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H356 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2126 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1040 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H2732 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1932 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H356 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2126 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1040 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H2732 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1932 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1934.pdf |