MA H1934 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4268
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a Massachusetts rare disease advisory council. Public Health.
Title
To create a Massachusetts rare disease advisory council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4268 |
2019-10-04 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1758 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2760
H1661 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2941 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2945 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2134 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S806 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2776 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied S1877
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4076 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4268 (Replaced by) 2020-07-02 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1661 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2941 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2945 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2134 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S806 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2776 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied S1877
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4076 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4268 (Replaced by) 2020-07-02 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1934.pdf |