MA H1935 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4853
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require employer policies and training to prevent unlawful harassment, including sexual harassment. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To require policies and training to prevent unlawful harassment, including sexual harassment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4853 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1171 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4853
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S955 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1036 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1019 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1020 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4853 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S955 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1036 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1019 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1020 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4853 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1935 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1935.pdf |