MA H1953 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3699
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to patient information regarding reconstructive surgery. Public Health.
Title
Relative to patient access to information regarding breast reconstructive surgery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3699 |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3699 (Replaced by) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1953 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1953.pdf |