MA H1959 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to patient information regarding reconstructive surgery. Public Health.
Title
Relative to patient access to information regarding breast reconstructive surgery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1959 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1959.pdf |