MA H1975 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4467
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Jones of North Reading and deMacedo of Plymouth, a petition of Bradley H. Jones, Jr., Viriato Manuel deMacedo and others establishing an independent redistricting commission and criteria for redistricting for Congressional districts. Election Laws.
Title
Establishing an independent redistricting commission and criteria for redistricting for congressional districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4467 |
2011-03-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/23/2011 from 01:30 PM-03:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4467 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1975 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10059&generalCourtId=1 |