MA H1978 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit indemnity and insurance responsibility for general contractors and subcontractors in construction work. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to prohibit contract provisions requiring subcontractors to assume liability for negligence of others
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3121 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2487 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S354 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1589 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3121 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2487 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S354 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1589 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1978 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1978.pdf |