MA H198 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4911
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Lewis of Framingham, a petition of Jack Patrick Lewis and others that investigations of applications for adoption or foster parenting conducted by the Department of Children and Families include veterinary records of animals maintained on the premises. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to animal welfare and DCF regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H4911 |
2024-07-25 | House | Amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2024-07-25 | House | Read second |
2024-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2024-07-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-07-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4911 |
2024-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-02-15 | House | Accompanied by S90 |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S90 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H198
S2552 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S190 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2552
S533 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4911 (Replaced by) 2024-07-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2552 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S190 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2552
S533 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4911 (Replaced by) 2024-07-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H198 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H198.pdf |