MA H2002 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study issues relative to commission sales rates. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to commission sales rates
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5023 |
2021-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2042 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2077 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2660 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2078 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1327 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2077 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2660 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2078 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1327 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2002 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2002.pdf |