MA H2008 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide public notice and input to plans for significant physical alterations to state parks and other public natural resource lands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To provide public input into changes to public lands and buildings located thereon
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Geraldine Creedon [D] | Sen. Susan Fargo [D] |
Rep. Cleon Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4442 |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4442 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2008 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12705&generalCourtId=1 |