MA H2011 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to expanding access to healthy food choices in vending machines on state property. Public Health.
Title
Relative to expanding access to healthy food choices in vending machines on state property
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Rep. Martha Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3975 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3975 (Replaced by) 2014-07-28 - Bill referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2011 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2011.pdf |