MA H2014 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a review of existing staffing levels of environmental police officers in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to protecting the natural resources of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4442 |
2011-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4442 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2014 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11525&generalCourtId=1 |