MA H2015 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish rules and regulations for the fishing of herring within the waters of the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to inshore resource depletion
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4463 |
2011-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2015 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13478&generalCourtId=1 |