MA H2016 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4449
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Vincent of Revere, a petition of RoseLee Vincent that first responders wear protective gear when responding to overdoses. Public Health.
Title
Requiring first responders to wear protective gear when responding to overdoses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4449 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1653 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
S1339 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S793 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1463 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
S1339 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S793 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1463 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2016 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2016.pdf |