MA H2045 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a foreign language education seal of biliteracy for students. Education.
Title
Relative to the state seal of biliteracy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4678 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S311 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H285 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2045.pdf |