MA H2058 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle insurance surcharges. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-12-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2058 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9492&generalCourtId=1 |