MA H2076 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a program to convert licensed nursing facilities to community-based residences. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to promoting innovation in eldercare services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-14 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 15, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2035 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2286
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S360 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S359 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S344 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S339 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H346 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2888 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H971 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H972 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S360 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S359 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S344 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S339 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H346 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2888 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H971 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H972 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2238 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2076 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2076.pdf |