MA H208 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to large project based alcoholic beverages licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to large project based licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H346 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H40 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4305
H234 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H233 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S190 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H40 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4305
H234 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H233 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S190 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3848 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2019
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H208 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H208.pdf |