MA H2086 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require safety training for operators of jet skis, surf jets or wetbikes. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To jet ski safety
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2086 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2086.pdf |