MA H2134 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S1385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S1385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to collaborative drug therapy management optimization. Public Health.
Title
Relative to collaborative drug therapy management optimization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied S1385 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1385 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2134 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2134.pdf |