MA H2138 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce human exposure to particulate matter pollution. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Reducing human exposure to particulate matter pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4550 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2133 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H464 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2121 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
H2139 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4234 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2394 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2617
H4550 (Replaced by) 2018-05-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H464 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H2121 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
H2139 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4234 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2394 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2617
H4550 (Replaced by) 2018-05-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2138.pdf |