MA H214 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4584
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of slot machines in veterans' organizations. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the use of slot machines in veterans' organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4584 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H1474 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3625 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4584 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3625 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4584 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H214.pdf |