MA H2155 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to safety and emergency preparedness training for aviation service workers. Export Development.
Title
Requiring legal aviation service worker training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-10-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-10-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-09-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in 222 |
2017-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Export Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1234 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2155 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2155.pdf |