MA H2156 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to alternate members of the Conservation Commission of the town of Freetown. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for alternate members of the Conservation Commission of the town of Freetown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-08-02 | House | Enacted |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-05-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3022 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted for S3065
H5400 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2022
S3065 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2022
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3022 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted for S3065
H5400 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2022
S3065 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2156 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2156.pdf |