MA H2173 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the payment of police officers under certain public construction projects. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the timely and consistent payment of law enforcement personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-30 | House | Accompanied by S1560 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H1052 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1634 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H38 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied H202
H1052 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1634 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2173.pdf |